Morning Report for May 17, 2005
Headquarters Daily Report
REGION III
MANAGEMENT CHANGES IN NUCLEAR MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Licensee/Facility:
NUCLEAR MANAGEMENT CORP. Kewaunee KEWAUNEE, Wisconsin Dockets: 05000305 [1] W-2-LP License No: | Notification:
MR Number: 3-2005-0008 Date: 05/17/2005 Tel. Call to Branch Chief |
Discussion:
The Nuclear Management Company, LLC, (NMC) announced recent changes in its upper management structure at Kewaunee: Craig Lambert (NMC), currently the Acting Site Vice President at Kewaunee, has been replaced by Mike Gaffney (Dominion Resources Inc.), effective May 16, 2005. Mr. Gaffney's prior assignment was the Director of Station Safety and Licensing at Surry.
Additionally, Tom Breene, previously the Kewaunee Engineering Systems Manager, was recently named to fill the vacant Regulatory Affairs Manager position. Mr. Breene's prior assignments were with NMC at Prairie Island as both the Licensing Manager and Manager Nuclear Oversight, and most recently Point Beach where he held the position of Performance Assessment Manager.
Regional Action: None.
Accession Numbers:
Accession No | Accession Date |
ML051370590 | 05/17/2005 |
Contacts:
Name | Office Abbrev | Phone No | E-Mail |
KOZAK, THOMAS J | R3 | (630) 829-9866 | TJK4@nrc.gov |
Page Last Reviewed/Updated Thursday, March 25, 2021